Malone v. Dintleman et al

Defendant: Whal, Teresa Kisro and Charles Dintleman
Plaintiff: William A Malone
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00125
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 1 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/6/2013. (tjk)
July 31, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DISMISSING CASE for failure to prosecute. Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/31/13. (bkl)
July 31, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/bkl) in favor of Whal, Charles Dintleman, Teresa Kisro against William A Malone. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/31/13. (bkl)
March 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, granting 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A Malone. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants DINTLEMAN, KISRO, and WHAL: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/25/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malone v. Dintleman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Kisro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dintleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Malone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]