Malone v. Illinois Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: William A Malone
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2013cv00127
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 1 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/6/2013. (tjk)
September 20, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 23 . The Court dismisses this case and directs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/20/2013. (jdh)
September 20, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/anm) in favor of Illinois Department of Corrections against William A Malone. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/20/2013. (anm)
March 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, granting 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A Malone. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendant ILLINOIS DEPARTMENT of CORRECTIONS: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/25/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. Illinois Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.