Sanders v. Cowell et al

Defendant: Dave White, Edward H Birkner and Todd W Cowell
Plaintiff: Jason Sanders
Case Number: 3:2013cv00258
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Livingston
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 22 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel; GRANTING IN PART 23 Motion for Subpoenas (1); GRANTING IN PART 24 Motion for Subpoenas (2); DENYING 25 Motion to Compel; DENYING 28 Motion to Direct Answer ; GRANTING 29 Motion for Service of Process; DENYING 30 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel; GRANTING 31 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/24/13. (sgp)
October 1, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 35 Motion for Leave to File; GRANTING IN PART 40 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/1/13. (sgp)
October 29, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 42 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel; DENYING AS MOOT 46 Motion to Amend/Correct; GRANTING IN PART 47 Motion for Subpoenas. Clerk Directed to provide Plaintiff blank subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/29/13. (sgp)
November 22, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 52 Motion for subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/22/13. (sgp)
January 6, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court GRANTS the motion (Doc. 66 ) as to Cowell and DISMISSES the claims against Cowell without prejudice. Because the plaintiff has an absolute right to dismiss his claims against Birkner at the present time, the Court finds that those claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close this case.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/6/2014. (jdh)
April 17, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson, DEFENDANT WHITE is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice for failure to state a claim against him upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants COWELL and BIRKNER: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 4/17/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Cowell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward H Birkner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd W Cowell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sanders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]