Charles v. Gaetz et al

Plaintiff: Craig Charles
Defendant: Vipin K Shah and Christie Brown
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00284
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Perry
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 44 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; adopting 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Craig Charles. The Court denies as moot 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/22/2013. (jdh)
November 15, 2013 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Granting 46 MOTION in Stipulation filed by Craig Charles. The Court dismisses count 2 against Shah without prejudice and directs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/14/2013. (jdh)
April 16, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, COUNT 3 is DISMISSED without prejudice as duplicative. Defendants GAETZ, DEEN, and MILLER are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to complete, on Pl aintiffs behalf, a summons and form USM-285 for service of process on Defendants SHAH and BROWN; the Clerk shall issue the completed summons. The United States Marshal SHALL serve Defendants SHAH and BROWN pursuant to Rule 4(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/16/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Charles v. Gaetz et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Charles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vipin K Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]