United States of America v. Real Property Located at 20 Kassing Drive, Fairview Heights, St. Clair County, Illinois

Defendant: Real Property Located at 20 Kassing Drive, Fairview Heights, St. Clair County, Illinois and all attachments, improvemens and appurtenances thereto
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00298
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lennil L Johnson, granting 18 MOTION to Strike filed by Thomas A Lechien, striking and alternatively denying 22 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Lennil L Johnson, striking and alternatively denying 23 MOTION for Judicial Intervention filed by Lennil L Johnson, and denying 24 MOTION to Copy filed by Lennil L Johnson. Show Cause Response due by 3/10/2014. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/10/2014. (mtm)
February 20, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING clerk to enter default judgment against Lennil L. Johnson, and further granting 30 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by United States of America, and 32 MOTION to Quash SUBPOENA filed by Thomas A Lechien. Lennil L Johnson terminated. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/20/2014. (mtm)
February 21, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Default judgment is entered against Lennil L. Johnson. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/21/2014. (slj)
March 17, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT, granting 47 MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Judgment and Decree for Forfeiture by United States of America. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/17/2014. (mtm)
April 1, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IMPOSING $1,000.00 sanction and/or civil fine on Lennil L. Johnson, pursuant to Rule 11 and 18 U.S.C. 983(h), payable to the Clerk of the Court instanter. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/1/2014. (mtm)
September 22, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/19/14. (lmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 20 Kassing Drive, Fairview Heights, St. Clair County, Illinois
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 20 Kassing Drive, Fairview Heights, St. Clair County, Illinois and all attachments, improvemens and appurtenances thereto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]