McCain v. Herring, et al

Defendant: Unknown Party 2, Unknown Party 1, Mr Dunn, S A Godinez, Terri Anderson, Jennett Cowan, Mr Herring, Mr Joy, Mr Getz, Mr Mulholland, Mr Laurance, Mr Henrich and Mr Anthony
Plaintiff: Matthew M L McCain
Case Number: 3:2013cv00300
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 50 in its entirety. Denying re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew M L McCain. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/16/2013. (jdh)
August 30, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ORDERS McCain to pay the entire initial partial filing fee of $22.77. The Court STAYS this case until further order of the Court and WARNS McCain that if he does not pay the entire initial partial filing fee of $22.77, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/30/2013. (jdh)
October 1, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting 76 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Matthew M L McCain, and denying 78 MOTION filed by Matthew M L McCain.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/1/2013. (jdh)
April 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, granting 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Matthew M L McCain.Plaintiff's motion for TRO and preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. 2 ) is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier for an evidentiary hearing and issuance of a report and recommendation. COUNTS 2 and 3 are DISMISSED without prejudice. DEFENDANTS ATCHERSON, COFFEEY, PHELPS, UNKNOWN PARTY 3 (C/O JOHN DOE 2), UNKNOW N PARTY 4 (NURSE JANE DOE 2), and UNKNOWN PARTY 5 (DOCTOR JOHN DOE 3) are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. As to COUNT 1, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to complete, on Plaintiff's behalf, a summons and form USM-285 for service of process on Defendants HERRINGTON, COWAN, LAURANCE, GODINEZ, ANDERSON, DUNN, JOY, GETZ, MULHOLLAND, HENRICH, ANTHONY. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/2/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCain v. Herring, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party 2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party 1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S A Godinez
Represented By: Lisa A. Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Anderson
Represented By: Lisa A. Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennett Cowan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Herring
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Joy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Getz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Mulholland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Laurance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Henrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Anthony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew M L McCain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]