Rogers v. Halford

Plaintiff: James L Rogers
Defendant: Mary Halford
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00304
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and initial filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/5/13. (sgp)
May 5, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Court hereby ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Wilkerson's Report (Doc. 23 ) in its entirety, GRANTS in part (as to the payment of the court reporter's fee for the canceled deposition) and DENIES in part (as to the request for immediate di smissal of this suit) Defendant Halford's sanctions motion (Doc. 22 ), ORDERS Plaintiff to pay $82.00 to defense counsel (Htin Myat Win, Illinois Attorney General's Office, 500 South Second Street, Springfield, IL 62706) no later than May 26, 2014, and STAYS this case pending payment of the $82.00 sanction. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 05/05/14. (dkd)
June 9, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In accordance with Rule 37(b)(2)(A)(v) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/9/2014. (ajt)
May 2, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all Eighth Amendment claims against Defendants S.A. GODINEZ, VICTOR DOZIER, KIM REEDER and "HEALTH CARE PROVIDER" are DISMISSED with prejudice for fa ilure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Defendants S.A. GODINEZ, VICTOR DOZIER, KIM REEDER and "HEALTH CARE PROVIDER" are therefore DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendant MARY HALFORD: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 5/2/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rogers v. Halford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Halford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]