J.B. v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: J.B.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00326
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REASSIGNING case to Chief Judge Herndon to serve as presiding judge. Final Pretrial Conference and argument on all motions set for 5/1/2014 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge David R. Herndon. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge David R. Herndon.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/28/2014. (mtm)
April 23, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/23/13. (amv)
April 14, 2014 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/14/2014. (mtm)
October 28, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding discovery dispute held on 10/22/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/28/2013. (anj)
December 16, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 12/16/2013 status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/16/2013. (anj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.B. v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. MacWilliams
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Represented By: Peter W. Herzog, III
Represented By: Kathleen B. Barry
Represented By: Dan H. Ball
Represented By: Stefan Mallen
Represented By: Stephen E. Marshall
Represented By: Jason C. Rose
Represented By: Dino S. Sangiamo
Represented By: Paul F. Strain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: George Erick Rosemond
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Ralph D. McBride
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Joshua C. Ezrin
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: John T Boundas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]