Sonnenberg v. Scheinberg et al

Defendant: Nelson Burtnick, Rational Entertainment Enterprises, LTD, Oldford Group, LTD, Isai Scheinberg, Paul Tate, PYR Software, LTD, Stelekram, LTD and Sphene International, LTD
Plaintiff: Kelly Sonnenberg
Case Number: 3:2013cv00344
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 51 Response filed by Kelly Sonnenberg. Order acknowledging dismissal and dismissing without prejudice Isai Scheinberg, Sphene International, LTD, Stelekram, LTD, Paul Tate, Nelson Burtnick and PYR Software, LTD. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 12/12/13. (klh, )
January 13, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Oldford Group, LTD without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 1/13/2014. (slj)
March 14, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 33 Motion for Hearing and denying as moot 11 Motion for Hearing. The Court ALLOWS plaintiff up to and including April 12, 2014 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/14/14. (klh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonnenberg v. Scheinberg et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Burtnick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rational Entertainment Enterprises, LTD
Represented By: Laura E. Craft-Schrick
Represented By: David B. Deitch
Represented By: Rachel Hirsch
Represented By: A. Jeff Ifrah
Represented By: William J. Niehoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oldford Group, LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isai Scheinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Tate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYR Software, LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stelekram, LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sphene International, LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Sonnenberg
Represented By: Michael J. Gras
Represented By: Lloyd M. Cueto
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]