Demitro v. Roberts

Petitioner: Dennis Demitro
Respondent: Brad Roberts
Case Number: 3:2013cv00394
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Marion
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier. The deadline for payment of the filing fee is June 4, 2013 (Doc. 7 ), and failure to pay will result in the dismissal of the petition.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent shall answer the petition or otherwise plead within thirty days of the date this order is entered. (Action due by 6/4/2013). Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/10/2013. (tjk)
February 4, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Respondent's 20 motion to dismiss petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus as untimely is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/4/2014. (kbl)
February 4, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/4/2014. (slj)
October 16, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying petition for habeas relief. The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 10/16/2014. (jmt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demitro v. Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Demitro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Roberts
Represented By: John R. Schleppenbach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]