Hatcher v. Cheng et al

Defendant: Board of Trustees of Southern Illinois University and Rita Cheng
Plaintiff: Laura J Hatcher
Case Number: 3:2013cv00407
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 MOTION to Strike. Docs. 27 , 28 , 29 , 30 , 31 ,and 32 are STRICKEN. Should defendants again seek dismissal of plaintiffs amended complaint, they are granted leave to re-file their arguments in one single brief, which shall not exceed 20 pages excluding the certificate of service, by January 3, 2014.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 12/18/2013. (mtm)
August 7, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Kimberly Kempf-Leonard, Board of Trustees of Southern Illinois University, and Rita Cheng. Counts 2, 3, and 4 of the Amended Complaint (Doc. 22) are DISMISSED with prejudice.The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Rita Cheng and Dr. Kimberly Kempf-Leonard as Defendants and to enter judgment accordingly at the conclusion of this case.This case shall proceed on Count 1 against Defendant Board of Trustees of Southern Illinois University. The dispositive motions deadline in this case is RESET to September 9, 2014. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/7/2014. (ajt)
October 24, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 72 Motion for Reconsideration re 70 Order granting in part Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/24/14. (klh2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatcher v. Cheng et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Southern Illinois University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Cheng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura J Hatcher
Represented By: Cassie R Korando
Represented By: Shari R. Rhode
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]