Downs v. Indy Mac Mortgage Services, FSB et al

Defendant: Federal National Associates, One West Bank, FSB, Indy Mac Mortgage Services, FSB, Charles Stegmeyer and Quicken Loans, Inc
Plaintiff: Kim Downs
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00858
Filed: August 19, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 4 Motion for service of process at government expense, without prejudice. Plaintiff is allowed up to and including September 23, 2013 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/22/2013. (mtm)
September 13, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Downs' renewed motion to proceed IFP is denied. Downs' amended complaint is dismissed and she is not granted leave to amend. Downs claims under the FDCPA are dismissed without prejudice. Downs remaining claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/13/2013. (mtm)
September 16, 2013 9 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/16/2013. (slj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Downs v. Indy Mac Mortgage Services, FSB et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Associates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank, FSB
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indy Mac Mortgage Services, FSB
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Stegmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Downs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]