Howery v. Harrington et al

Defendant: Unknown Party, Security Officer, Placement Coordinator, Rick Harrington and Counselor
Plaintiff: Bernon L Howery
Case Number: 3:2013cv00896
Filed: August 28, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the amended complaint (Doc. 12 ) fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. Accordingly, all Defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is ADVISED that this dismissal shall not count as one of his allotted strikes under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before June 13, 2014, Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint. Failure to file a second amended complaint will likely result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2014). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 5/14/2014. (tjk)
December 29, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff is assessed a STRIKE for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/22/2014. (tjk)
September 24, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED that COUNTS 1, 2 and 3 fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, and thus are DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before October 24, 2013, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, signed by each named plaintiff. Plaintiff is ADVISED that if he fails to file an amended complaint by the prescribed deadline and in strict compliance with this Order, this action will be closed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Amended Pleadings due by 10/24/2013). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/24/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howery v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placement Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernon L Howery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.