Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company et al v. Goshen Air Center Inc et al

Plaintiff: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company and TBT Aviation LLC
Defendant: Goshen Air Center Inc, Justin Dale and Randall Sharkey
Mediator: Daniel J Sigler
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00081
Filed: March 4, 2011
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Elkhart
Presiding Judge: Roger B Cosbey
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Court will afford the parties one further opportunity to show that supplemental jurisdiction does in fact exist, with briefs in support due by October 11, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 9/26/2011. (kjm)
October 13, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER -- Goshen Air Center's cause of action against Star Insurance and Star Insurance's cause of action against Arlington/Roe and any associated counterclaims are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is to show Estlic k-Girvin & Lefever Insurance Agency d/b/a Star Insurance Agency and Arlington/Roe & Co., Inc. TERMINATED from the case. Motion to Dismiss 47 filed by Goshen Air Center Inc is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 10/12/2011. (kjm)
March 9, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER; plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint forthwith, properly alleging their own citizenship and that of defendants Dale and Sharkey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 3/9/11. (jcp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company et al v. Goshen Air Center Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Lloyd Palmison
Represented By: Calvert S Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TBT Aviation LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lloyd Palmison
Represented By: Calvert S Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goshen Air Center Inc
Represented By: Andrew B Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Dale
Represented By: Andrew B Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Sharkey
Represented By: Andrew B Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Daniel J Sigler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]