Fike v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Miscellaneous_party: SSA (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: Cecil W Fike
Case Number: 1:2011cv00168
Filed: May 20, 2011
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: De Kalb
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Rudy Lozano
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER REVERSING the decision of the Commissioner. The case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings in accordance with this Opinion. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Pla Cecil W Fike and against Dft Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 4/10/2012. (lns)
April 11, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER REVERSING the decision of the Commissioner. The case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings in accordance with this Opinion. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Pla Cecil W Fike and against Dft Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 4/11/2012. (kjm)
August 23, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 33 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Plaintiff Cecil W Fike. Attorney fees awarded in the amount of $9,171.81 as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 8/23/12. (cer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fike v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous_party: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil W Fike
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]