Saul v. Prince Manufacturing Corporation

Plaintiff: Richard C Saul, Jr
Defendant: Prince Manufacturing Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00270
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Noble
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 14 Plaintiff's Oral Request to Perform Limited Discovery. Defendant DIRECTED to file Administrative Record by 11/26/2012. Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment to be filed by 12/11/2012. Cross-Responses to be filed by 1/2/2013. No Reply Briefs will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 10/12/12. (cer)
January 22, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 30 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Richard C Saul, Jr. Clerk directed to show Pla's Response in Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 1/22/2013. (lns)
July 24, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Prince Manufacturing Corporation, DISMISSING 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard C Saul, Jr. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/24/2013. (lns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saul v. Prince Manufacturing Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C Saul, Jr
Represented By: Douglas E Johnston
Represented By: James P Buchholz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: Thomas R DeVoe
Represented By: Danielle B Tucker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]