Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC v. Real Action Paintball Inc et al

Plaintiff: Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC
Defendant: Real Action Paintball Inc, Apon Industries Corp, Apon International Group Inc, KT Tran, Conrad Sun and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2012cv00296
Filed: August 31, 2012
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 15 First MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC. Dft RAP4 to ship to Pla w/in one day of the entry of this Order the items outlined and to the address li sted. The shipping by RAP4 is to specify delivery on or by 9/17/12. Dft RAP4 shall provide Pla's attorneys with the tracking information w/in one day of the entry of this Order. Testing will commence no sooner than 9/19/12 to allow Dft RAP4 to have a representative present during it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 9/13/2012. (lns)
February 8, 2013 200 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 160 MOTION (Third) to Compel by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART all as is outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 2/8/13. (cer)
February 21, 2013 221 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 203 MOTION Clarification re 201 Order filed by Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC. The Court's Order dated 2/8/2013 (DE 201) stands as written. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 2/21/2013. (lns)
February 25, 2013 222 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 160 MOTION (Third) to Compel by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC. The Motion is GRANTED as to Request No. 1 of the Fourth Request for Production and RAP4 is hereby ORDERED to produce a complete copy of its OS Co mmerce database on or before March 5, 2013 as outlined in Order. The Motion is DENIED AS MOOT as to Interrogatory No. 2 and Request No. 11 of the Third Request for Production as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 2/25/13. (cer)
March 7, 2013 228 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 224 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 209 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants by Defendants KT Tran, Real Action Paintball Inc. All Defendants GRANTED until 3/11/2013 to serve a Respo nse to 209 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC. If Defendants wish to file a transcript of Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC's 30(b)(6) deposition under seal, the Court will grant them leave to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 3/7/13. (cer)
March 29, 2013 270 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 240 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories by Defendant Real Action Paintball Inc; 251 MOTION to Compel by Defendant Real Action Paintball Inc. The Motions are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 3/29/13. (cer)
July 18, 2013 331 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 328 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 312 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiff Should Not Be Held in Contempt of Court and for Sanctions by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC. Sinc e the Response deadline is today, however, Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC is afforded until 7/23/2013 to file its Response. Real Action Paintball Inc's Reply deadline is extended to 8/2/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 7/18/13. (cer). Modified on 7/18/2013. (cer)
August 16, 2013 349 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER STRIKING 323 MOTION (Second Amended) for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC; DENYING 37 MOTION (Joint) to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue by Defendants Apon Industries Corp , Apon International Group Inc, Conrad Sun, KT Tran, Real Action Paintball Inc; GRANTING 137 MOTION (Amended) for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC; GRANTING 340 MOTION for Leave to File Seventeen Page Rep ly Brief by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC; DENYING 342 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike 336 Response to Motion, 337 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC; DENYING 306 MOTION to Amend/Correct 11 Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Real Action Paintball Inc; DENYING AS MOOT 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC. The Court ENTERS a Preliminary Injunction against Defendants KT Tran and Real Action Paintball Inc as outlined in Order. Defendants ORDERED to immediately segregate and preserve, and to permit Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC, or its designated representatives, to inspect and inventory projectiles as outlined in Order. Plaintiff has already posted bond and no additional security is required. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 8/16/13. (cer)
September 30, 2013 373 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 209 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC; DENYING 88 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants RAP4 and K.T. Tran by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC and [10 1] MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Real Action Paintball, Inc., Tran, and their Counsel for violating the TRO by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC; and GRANTING 332 Third MOTION for Sanctions Regarding Defendants' Violat ion of the Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC. Defendants must pay Plaintiff through their attorneys a $10,000 fine within seven days of this order. After the fine is paid, Plaintiff's counsel sh ould so notify the Court. Within fourteen days of this order, Plaintiff must submit to this Court an accounting for its attorney's fees as explained above. Defendants shall have fourteen days to respond. Plaintiff may file a reply within seven days. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/30/13. (lhc)
October 11, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. The 66 MOTION for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery by Defendants Conrad Sun, KT Tran, Real Action Paintball Inc is GRANTED as outlined in Order. The 56 EMERGENCY MOTION to Compel Defendants Real Action Paintball, Inc. & S un by Plaintiff Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as outlined in Order. The 69 MOTION to Compel by Defendants Conrad Sun, KT Tran, Real Action Paintball Inc is DEEMED MOOT. The remaining documents responsi ve to the granted portions of Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Compel are to be produced by noon (EST) on 10/15/2012. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/31/2012 at 10:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey.Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 10/11/12. (cer)
October 31, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Pla leave to file another amended complaint instanter deleting the the sentence in paragraph 10. Pla's 86 Motion to Strike this reference is therefore deemed MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 10/31/2012. (lns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC v. Real Action Paintball Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Tactical Ordnance Systems LLC
Represented By: Stephen R Snyder
Represented By: David J Piell
Represented By: Randall L Morgan
Represented By: Michael L Blumenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Action Paintball Inc
Represented By: Paul B Overhauser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apon Industries Corp
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: Patrick J Olmstead, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apon International Group Inc
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: Patrick J Olmstead, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KT Tran
Represented By: Paul B Overhauser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad Sun
Represented By: Paul B Overhauser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]