Mid-America Foundation Supply Inc v. Konga Marine Logistics LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mid-America Foundation Supply Inc
Defendant: Konga Marine Logistics LLC, Al Malins Insurance Inc and Chuck Hahn
Case Number: 1:2012cv00328
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 132 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Konga Marine Logistics LLC and DISMISSES the claims in Konga's Third Party Complaint against Abyss WITH PREJUDICE. Konga's Third Party Complaint against two other defendants remains pending. This Order only dismisses the claims against Abyss. DENYING AS MOOT 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ThirdParty Defendant Abyss Maritime Inc; and DENYING AS MOOT 119 First RULE 56 MOTION to Strike 107 Supplement Riverlands Survey by ThirdParty Plaintiff Konga Marine Logistics LLC. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/17/2014. (lhc)
September 24, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Dfts to supplement the record by filing an Amended Notice of Removal on/bf 10/9/2012 as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 9/24/2012. (lns)
October 16, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 77 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer by Defendants/ Cross Defendants Al Malins Insurance Inc, Chuck Hahn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 10/16/13. (cer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-America Foundation Supply Inc v. Konga Marine Logistics LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-America Foundation Supply Inc
Represented By: Paul O Sauerteig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konga Marine Logistics LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Malins Insurance Inc
Represented By: Philip E Kalamaros
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Hahn
Represented By: Philip E Kalamaros
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]