Earnhart v. Cargill Incorporated et al

Defendant: Provimi North America Inc
Plaintiff: Steven Earnhart
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00129
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Noble
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 18 MOTION (First) to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Steven Earnhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 5/14/13. (cer)
July 30, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 39 MOTION (Joint) for Protective Order by Defendant Provimi North America Inc. The parties may, however, submit a revised proposed protective order consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c)(7) and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 7/30/13. (cer)
April 29, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cargill Incorporated filed by Cargill Incorporated. Defendant ORDERED to supplement the record by filing an Amended Notice of Removal by 5/13/2013 as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 4/29/13. (cer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Earnhart v. Cargill Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provimi North America Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Earnhart
Represented By: Matthew R Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]