Pringle v. Garcia et al

Plaintiff: Arthur D Pringle, III
Defendant: Marisa Garcia, Sergio E Garcia, Kerusso Konstruction Kompany LLC, Kerusso Real Estate LLC, Rehab Lending Tree LLC, Kerusso Real Estate and Kerusso Asset Management LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00022
Filed: February 5, 2009
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2012 142 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 115 Motion Instanter to Quash Subpoenas Requesting Discovery Directed to Unnames Defendants and/or Previously Dubbed Garcia II Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 7/20/2012. (rmn)
February 13, 2013 189 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER finding that the Motions to Dismiss 105 and 113 are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 2/13/2013. (rmn)
May 8, 2013 198 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 173 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. Because Defendants proposed amended answer was prematurely filed, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to STRIKE Defendants 178 Amended Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/8/13. (mc)
May 8, 2013 199 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion for Default Judgment or in the Alternative, to Compel Good Faith Discovery. The Court ORDERS Defendants to locate the requested documents and disclose them to Plaintiff on or before 5/22/2013. Discovery deadline is extended to 5/23/2013 for the sole purpose of allowing Defendants to produce these documents. IfDefendants are unable to produce the documents, the Court ORDERS Defendants to file with the Court by May 23, 2013, a notice stating with detail the efforts made to locate and produce the documents.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/8/13. (mc)
November 25, 2013 250 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 201 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff has until 12/27/2013 to file a supplemental brief describing the amount of interest she is owed in light of this judgment. She shall also has 12/27/2013 to file an affidavit supporting her claim for replevin that is compliant with Indiana Code § 32-35-2-4. In-Person Status Conference SET for 1/7/2014 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Chief Judge Philip P Simon. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 11/25/2013. cc: Alpha & Omega Real Estate LLC c/o Elva Garcia, Elva Garcia, Jaime Garcia (tc)
June 2, 2009 26 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses and STRIKES without prejudice Defendants' third, fourth, fifth, sixth, and eight affirmative defenses in Defendants Answer filed on 3/31/09 DE 9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/2/09. (sda) (Modified by adding the word OPINION in text on 6/2/2009) (sda).
April 23, 2014 272 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 239 Motion to Dismiss. The claims against Jaime Garcia are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff will have thirty days to file an amended complaint if she believes she can cure the deficiencies in the complaint addressed by this order. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 4/23/14. cc: Jaime Garcia (mc)
June 4, 2009 27 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demand. The Court GRANTS the instant Motion to the extent that it requests that the Court strike the jury demand of Defendants Rehab L ending Tree, LLC, Kerusso Konstruction Kompany, LLC, and Kerusso Real Estate, LLC and hereby STRIKES the jury demand as to these Defendants. The Court further GRANTS the instant Motion and STRIKES the jury demand as to all Defendants with regard to C ount III of the First Amended Complaint. However, as to the non-Kerusso Entity Defendants, the Court DENIES the instant Motion as to the jury demand on Count II of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/4/09. (sda)
January 6, 2012 97 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 74 Motion to Strike and 72 Motion to Dismiss, and the claims against these defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pringle has until 2/24/2012 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 1/6/2012. cc: Peter G Koransky (tc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pringle v. Garcia et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur D Pringle, III
Represented By: Peter G Koransky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio E Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerusso Konstruction Kompany LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerusso Real Estate LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehab Lending Tree LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerusso Real Estate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerusso Asset Management LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]