Stillwater of Crown Point Homeowner's Association Inc et al v. Kovich et al

Plaintiff: Stillwater of Crown Point Homeowner's Association Inc, Roger P Mahoney, Kevin J McKenna, Margaret McKenna and Kent Kolodziej
Defendant: Jack Kovich, Innovative Enterprises LTD, Robert Stiglich, Stillwater Properties LLC, Hawk Development Corp and Crown Point Indiana City of
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00157
Filed: June 4, 2009
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Referring Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2011 156 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: City of Crown Point is ORDERED to timely repair or replace the crossings at Greenview Place, Stillwater Parkway, and Crooked Creek Trail. All of Plaintiffs other claims against the City REMAIN PENDING.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/11/11. cc: Stiglich (mc)
October 11, 2011 157 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 90 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 103 Motion for Hearing; denying as moot 125 Motion for Hearing; granting 135 Rule 56 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/11/11. (mc)
February 26, 2014 202 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Robert Stiglich. The Court SETS this matter for a telephonic status and scheduling conference on 3/27/2014 11:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 2/26/14. cc: Stiglich (mc)
April 15, 2010 77 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 53 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 73 Motion Praecepe for ruling on motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 4/15/2010. (kds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stillwater of Crown Point Homeowner's Association Inc et al v. Kovich et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stillwater of Crown Point Homeowner's Association Inc
Represented By: Donna C Marron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger P Mahoney
Represented By: Donna C Marron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J McKenna
Represented By: Donna C Marron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret McKenna
Represented By: Donna C Marron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Kolodziej
Represented By: Donna C Marron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Kovich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Enterprises LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Stiglich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stillwater Properties LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawk Development Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Point Indiana City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]