Fifth Third Bank v. Double Tree Lake Estates LLC et al

Defendant: DBL Residential LP, Kenneth Matney, Anthony Meyer, Randall Minas, Doubletree Golf LLC and Double Tree Lake Estates LLC
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00233
Filed: June 29, 2011
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Referring Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER, DENYING 91 MOTION to Dismiss the Crossclaim filed by Anthony Meyer. The Receiver, on Double Tree's behalf, to file a Status Report by 6/22/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 5/23/12. (kjp)
February 12, 2013 153 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim Against Fifth Third Bank. The Court grants Defendant/Crossclaimant Anthony Meyer up to and including February 26,2013, in which to FILE his Amended Counterclaim consistent with this Opinion and Order. The Court grants in part and denies in part 140 Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike dft Meyer's Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 2/12/13. (kjp)
February 12, 2013 154 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Amend Counterclaim. The Court grants Defendant/Crossclaimant Kenneth Matney up to and including February 26, 2013, in which to FILE his Amended Counterclaim consistent with this Opinion and Order. The Court grants in part and denies in part 139 Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike dft Kenneth Matney's Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 2/12/13. (kjp)
April 5, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 152 Request for Order Directing Compliance with All Outstanding Discovery Requests and Written Clarification as to the DiscoveryPosition Taken by Fifth Third Bank on Electronic Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/5/13. (kjp)
July 23, 2014 242 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION, MEMORANDUM, AND ORDER: GRANTING Matneys 185 MOTION for Summary Judgment; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Fifth Third Banks 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Kenneth Matney as set forth in order; denying as MOOT 195 , 199 , 204 , 209 and 216 Motions to Strike. Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Fifth Third Bank will have until 8/8/2014 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 7/23/14. (mc)
September 16, 2014 254 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Denying 220 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendant Kenneth Matney. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 9/16/2014. (rmn)
February 21, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 54 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Against Fifth Third Bank and Randall Minas and FINDING MOOT Request for Additional Time to File Counterclaim against Fifth Third Bank and Crossclaim against Randall Minas. Meyer may include such claims along with his Answer to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 2/21/12. (kjp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fifth Third Bank v. Double Tree Lake Estates LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBL Residential LP
Represented By: Frederick L Carpenter
Represented By: Daniel L Freeland
Represented By: Sheila Ann Ramacci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Matney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Minas
Represented By: Gordon E Gouveia
Represented By: Catherine L Molnar-Boncela
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doubletree Golf LLC
Represented By: Frederick L Carpenter
Represented By: Daniel L Freeland
Represented By: Sheila Ann Ramacci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double Tree Lake Estates LLC
Represented By: Daniel L Freeland
Represented By: Frederick L Carpenter
Represented By: Sheila Ann Ramacci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Darren A Craig
Represented By: Jacob V Bradley
Represented By: Rex E Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]