Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Lake Erie Land Company et al

Defendant: Lake Erie Land Company, B&B LLC and Indiana State of
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Property-Owners Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00184
Filed: May 8, 2012
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 121 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: The parties are ordered to file supplemental briefing in support of their cross-motions for summary judgment. 71 87 Both parties shall file their initial brief no later than June 5, 2014 and may file a response to the opposing partys brief no later than June 20, 2014. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/6/2014.(rmn)
December 17, 2012 40 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 24 Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Lake Erie Land Company's Request for a Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 12/17/2012. (rmn)
July 15, 2013 81 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 70 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 7/15/2013. (rmn)
August 13, 2013 90 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting LEL's 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. To the extend that the request for relief contained in Plaintiff's Insurer's response 48 can be construed as a cross-motion, it is denied. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/13/2013. (rmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Lake Erie Land Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Erie Land Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&B LLC
Represented By: David E Woodward
Represented By: R Brian Woodward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: David L Taylor
Represented By: Sara M McClammer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Property-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Sara M McClammer
Represented By: David L Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]