Handzlik v. Lain et al

Defendant: Diane Patrick, John Widup, David Lain, Robert Taylor, Michelle Harris and Tom Baker
Plaintiff: Thomas M Handzlik
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00119
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Porter
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: John E Martin
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 101 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER taking under advisement defense 87 , 90 Motions seeking dismissal under 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a). However, the request of Defendant Michelle Harris for dismissal pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) (6) is DENIED. plaintiff is GRANTED to and including 6/30/2014 to submit a sworn declaration or affidavit to address specific issues as set forth in order. Defendants are granted to and including 7/21/2014 o file a response to the plaintiffs submission. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/22/14. cc: Handzlik (mc)
August 21, 2014 115 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 87 and 90 motions for summary judgment. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, the defendants are ORDERED to file a notice advising whether they wish to waive their exhaustion defense or proceed with a hearing. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/21/14. cc: Handzlik (mc)
July 11, 2013 15 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER re 4 Amended Complaint: the Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed as set forth in order, DISMISSES any and all other claims contained in the complaint; DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on David Lain, John Widup, Robert Taylor, Diane Patrick, Tom Baker, and Michelle Harris; and ORDERS that David Lain, John Widup, Robert Taylor, Diane Patrick, Tom Baker, and Michelle Harris respond only to the claims for which the pro se plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/11/13. cc: Handzlik, David Lain, John Widup, Robert Taylor, Diane Patrick, Tom Baker, and Michelle Harris(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Handzlik v. Lain et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Patrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Widup
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M Handzlik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]