United States of America v. ARG Corporation et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: ARG Corporation and Norbert R Toubes
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00311
Filed: July 30, 2010
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: South Bend Office
County: St. Joseph
Referring Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted MOTION for Reconsideration re 64 Amended Complaint of Order Allowing Amended Complaint filed by South Bend City of. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/6/2014 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Chief Judge Philip P Simon to discuss status of the case. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 5/30/2014. (kds)
June 27, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support and denying 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against ARG Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 6/27/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 6/27/2014. (rmc)
January 31, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 1/31/2011. (kds)
August 4, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; denying as moot 27 Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 8/4/11. (smp)
January 7, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 63 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 1/7/2014. (rmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. ARG Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Wayne T Ault - AUSA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARG Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert R Toubes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]