Harnish et al v. Liberty Farm Equine Reproduction Center LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brent Harnish, Julie Harnish, Steven Heckaman and Janis Kengis
Defendant: Liberty Farm Equine Reproduction Center LLC, DeGraff Stables Kentucky LLC, Extol of Ohio Inc, DeGraff Stables Inc and Robin L DeGraff
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00511
Filed: December 8, 2010
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: South Bend Office
County: St. Joseph
Referring Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2012 104 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with prejudice. Stables are therefore given 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint should they so choose. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 4/3/2012. (kds)
May 31, 2012 117 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting Gillespies' Motion to Dismiss 109 . The Court therefore lacks personal jurisdiction over Tim and Shannon Gillespie. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 5/31/2012. (kds)
July 23, 2012 121 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 112 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The First amended Third Party Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 7/23/12. (jld)
June 25, 2013 153 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTS 137 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to all challenged claims. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 6/25/2013. (tc)
May 6, 2011 32 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 5/6/2011. (kds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harnish et al v. Liberty Farm Equine Reproduction Center LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Harnish
Represented By: Timothy Michael Curran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Harnish
Represented By: Timothy Michael Curran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Heckaman
Represented By: Timothy Michael Curran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Kengis
Represented By: Timothy Michael Curran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Farm Equine Reproduction Center LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeGraff Stables Kentucky LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extol of Ohio Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeGraff Stables Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin L DeGraff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]