Crooks v. Household Finance Corporation III et al

Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Household Finance Corporation III, HSBC Mortgage Service, Steven D Garver, Julia Blackwell Gelinas, Michele Lorbieski Anderson, Melanie D Margolin and Lucy R Dollens
Plaintiff: David Crooks
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00221
Filed: May 24, 2011
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: South Bend Office
County: Elkhart
Referring Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2011 27 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER - granting 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lucy R Dollens, Melanie D Margolin, Michele Lorbieski Anderson, Julia Blackwell Gelinas, HSBC Mortgage Service, Household Finance Corporation III; Household Finance Corp III and HSBC Mtg Ser v, Gelinas, Anderson, Morgolin and Dollens dismissed with prejudice, and granting 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven D Garver and dismisses with prejudice all claims aainst Mr Grver pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civil Pro cedure 12(b)(1). Party Steven D Garver, Julia Blackwell Gelinas, HSBC Mortgage Service, Household Finance Corporation III, Melanie D Margolin, Michele Lorbieski Anderson and Lucy R Dollens terminated. Amended complaint to be filed by 9/14/2011. (see order for addl details). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/30/2011. (kds)
November 7, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss complaint. Amended complaint to be filed by 12/5/2011. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/7/2011. (kds)
March 1, 2012 42 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 36 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and for Entry of Final Judgment and an Award of Sanctions filed by Lucy R Dollens, Melanie D Margolin, Michele Lorbieski Anderson, Julia Blackwell Gelinas, HSBC Mortgage Service, Household Finance Corporation III.Mr Crooks is afforded to/including 3/22/2012 within which to show cause why sanctions shouldn't be entered against him. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/1/2012. (kds)
July 3, 2012 48 Featured Case ORDER denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration and imposes a sanction of $100, payable to Frost Brown Todd LLC for a portion of fees incurred by defendants having to defend against Mr Crook's second amended complaint and motion to reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/3/2012. (kds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Crooks v. Household Finance Corporation III et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Finance Corporation III
Represented By: David T Kasper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Service
Represented By: David T Kasper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D Garver
Represented By: Heidi K Koeneman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Blackwell Gelinas
Represented By: David T Kasper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Lorbieski Anderson
Represented By: David T Kasper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie D Margolin
Represented By: David T Kasper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy R Dollens
Represented By: David T Kasper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Crooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]