Grace Village Health Care Facilities Inc et al v. Lancaster Pollard and Co et al

Thirdparty_defendant: Peck Shaffer & Williams LLP, Jason L George and Allison M Binkley
Plaintiff: Grace Village Health Care Facilities Inc and National Fellowship Brethren Retirement Homes Incorporated
Defendant: Lancaster Pollard and Co, Steven W Kennedy, Peck Shaffer & Williams LLP, Jason L George and Allison M Binkley
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Lancaster Pollard and Co
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00295
Filed: July 25, 2011
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: South Bend Office
County: Kosciusko
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Referring Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judges Order -- 109 Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision by a District Judge re 107 Order Striking Document, filed by Lancaster Pollard and Co. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 8/6/2013. (lyb)
August 6, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DEEMING MOOT 114 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Lancaster Pollard and Co.; GRANTING 118 Motion to Amend/Correct (Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Third-Party Complaint) filed by Lancaster Pollard and Co. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 8/6/2013. (lyb)
September 7, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 60 defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal for Failure to State a Claim; DENYING 22 & 25 third-party defendants' motion to dismiss; FINDING MOOT 17 third-party defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND 39 defendants' motion to stay. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/7/12. (jld)
November 13, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER finding moot 73 Motion to Dismiss and 73 Motion to Stay; granting 82 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 11/13/2012. (kds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grace Village Health Care Facilities Inc et al v. Lancaster Pollard and Co et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Peck Shaffer & Williams LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Jason L George
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Allison M Binkley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Village Health Care Facilities Inc
Represented By: Matthew S Winings
Represented By: Bart A Karwath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fellowship Brethren Retirement Homes Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew S Winings
Represented By: Bart A Karwath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster Pollard and Co
Represented By: Patrick David Murphy
Represented By: Alfred J Weisbrod PHV, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven W Kennedy
Represented By: Patrick David Murphy
Represented By: Alfred J Weisbrod PHV, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peck Shaffer & Williams LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason L George
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison M Binkley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Lancaster Pollard and Co
Represented By: Patrick David Murphy
Represented By: Alfred J Weisbrod PHV, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]