Karger et al v. Menu Foods Income Fund Featured Case

Plaintiff: Dina Karger, Denise Vollmer, Dolly Prue-Cerda and Myrna Law
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Holdings Inc, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods Inc and Menu Foods Midwest Corp
 
Case Number: 4:2007cv00033
Filed: June 18, 2007
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Tippecanoe
Referring Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: Allen Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Midwest Corp, Menu Foods Inc, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods Holdings Inc (Filing fee $ 350.00; Receipt #2209820), filed by Dina Karger, Denise Vollmer, Dolly Prue-Cerda, Myrna Law. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tlr)
August 13, 2007 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Berkoff on behalf of Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Midwest Corp, Menu Foods Inc, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods Holdings Inc (Berkoff, Mark)
August 13, 2007 5
STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, by Defendants Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Midwest Corp, Menu Foods Inc, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods Holdings Inc, Plaintiffs Dina Karger, Denise Vollmer, Dolly Prue-Cerda, Myrna Law. (Berkoff, Mark)
August 14, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER approving 5 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, filed by Dolly Prue-Cerda, Myrna Law, Menu Foods Inc, Denise Vollmer, Menu Foods Midwest Corp, Dina Karger, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Holdings Inc, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc. The telephonic status conference set for 8/30/07 is vacated. Signed by Judge Paul R Cherry on 8/14/07. (mlc)
August 20, 2007 7
CONDITIONAL ORDER OF TRANSFER with parties having 15 days to object. (mlc)
September 14, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER transferring case to Multi-District Litigation Panel MDL #1850 to the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Unassigned on 9/14/07. (mlc)(file and certified docket sheet sent to District of New Jersey) Modified on 9/21/2007 to edit text (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Karger et al v. Menu Foods Income Fund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Karger
Represented By: Christopher A Moeller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Vollmer
Represented By: Christopher A Moeller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolly Prue-Cerda
Represented By: Christopher A Moeller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Law
Represented By: Christopher A Moeller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Mark A Berkoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited
Represented By: Mark A Berkoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings Inc
Represented By: Mark A Berkoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota Inc
Represented By: Mark A Berkoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc
Represented By: Mark A Berkoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corp
Represented By: Mark A Berkoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]