ARVINYL METAL LAMINATES CORP. et al v. ARVINYL METAL FINISHING GROUP, LLC et al

Defendant: ARVINYL METAL FINISHING GROUP, LLC, JOSEPH A. THOMAS, JOSEPH A. THOMAS KEOGH, THE COLUMBIA FIRST GROUP, LTD., CARL W. GROW, CARL W. GROW FAMILY, L.P., LAWRENCE BARTLETT, THE JOHN JENNEY TRUST, MARK MCCAUGHEY, JOHN GIDMAN and GREG B. STEVENS
Plaintiff: JAMES H. BARRETT and ARVINYL METAL LAMINATES CORP.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00486
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Presiding Judge: Larry J. McKinney
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants', Carl W. Grow, Greg B. Stevens, and the Columbia First Group, Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Defendants are given thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to show why summa ry judgment should not be entered in Barrett's favor with respect to Count IV. Barrett will have thirty (30) days thereafter to respond, and Defendants an additional fifteen (15) days to reply. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 8/24/2009. (TRG)
August 24, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Summary Judgment is GRANTED in favor of Plaintiff on Count IV of Defendants' counterclaim. Count IV of Defendants' counterclaim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Judgment shall enter accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 8/24/2010.(REO)
August 24, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court CLOSED JUDGMENT - Through an Order dated August 24, 2010, the Court granted judgment in favor of plaintiff, James H. Barrett, and against defendants, Carl W. Grow, Greg B. Stevens, and the Columbia First Group, Ltd., on defendants' outstanding counterclaim. Judgment is entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 8/24/2010.(REO)
November 13, 2008 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claim for contribution is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's 92 Motion to Dismiss, Strike or Stay Counterclaims is GRANTED. Counts I, II, and III of Defendants' Counterclaims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Only Count IV of Defendants' Counterclaims remains pending. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 11/13/08. (GJQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARVINYL METAL LAMINATES CORP. et al v. ARVINYL METAL FINISHING GROUP, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARVINYL METAL FINISHING GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH A. THOMAS
Represented By: Joseph A. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH A. THOMAS KEOGH
Represented By: Joseph A. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COLUMBIA FIRST GROUP, LTD.
Represented By: Michael Eugene Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL W. GROW
Represented By: Michael Eugene Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL W. GROW FAMILY, L.P.
Represented By: Joseph A. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE BARTLETT
Represented By: Joseph A. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE JOHN JENNEY TRUST
Represented By: Joseph A. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK MCCAUGHEY
Represented By: Joseph A. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN GIDMAN
Represented By: Joseph A. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG B. STEVENS
Represented By: Michael Eugene Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES H. BARRETT
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Hokanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARVINYL METAL LAMINATES CORP.
Represented By: J. Bradley Schooley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]