WHITMORE v. SYMONS INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.

Plaintiff: BRADFORD T. WHITMORE
Defendant: SYMONS INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00391
Filed: March 30, 2009
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Larry J. McKinney
Referring Judge: Larry J. McKinney
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY granting 75 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. The Court directs the Clerk to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/30/2012. (PG)
August 13, 2012 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY denying 151 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/13/2012. (PG)
September 23, 2013 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Wilmington Trust Co.'s 184 Motion for Entry of Default against Symons International Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/23/2013. (TMD)
March 1, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered regarding CCC's 83 Motion for Limited Discovery Relating to Motion to Set Aside Judgment (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 09391. (SWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: WHITMORE v. SYMONS INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADFORD T. WHITMORE
Represented By: Edward Paul Grimmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMONS INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]