ROBERTS v. CENDANT MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al

Defendant: FEIWELL & HANNOY, P.C., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION and CENDANT MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: JAMES A. ROBERTS, SR.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01438
Filed: October 28, 2011
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff shall have through March 21, 2012, in which to identify a plausible basis for invoking the court's limited jurisdiction over his claim of wrongful foreclosure. (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/2/2012.(JKS)
June 7, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss as this Court concludes that it does not have subject-matter jurisdiction over this matter. This action is dismissed without prejudice as against all defts. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/7/2013 (dist made to pltf) (CBU)
June 7, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CLOSED JUDGMENT-This case is dismissed without prej for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/7/2013 (dist made to pltf)(CBU)
October 31, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY Discussing Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - For the reasons explained in this Entry, the 6 plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order must be denied. Roberts has not established a basis for injunctive relief in this case. He has not presented any argument or evidence to show that he lacks an adequate remedy at law. Moreover, he has not shown a reasonable likelihood of success on the merits. Thus, the plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order 6 is DENIED. (SEE ENTRY). (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/31/2011. (JKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTS v. CENDANT MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEIWELL & HANNOY, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENDANT MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES A. ROBERTS, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.