MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOES 1-11

Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-11
Case Number: 1:2012cv01117
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ON DEFENDANT MICHAEL HARRISON'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES: For the reasons set forth above, Harrison's motion to dismiss 85 is DENIED in its entirety. Accordingly, Harrison's corresponding motion for attorney fees 87 is also DENIED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/18/2013. Copy sent to Michael Harris via US Mail. (DW)
July 29, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO ROBERT JOHNSON: This cause is before the Court on the Plaintiff's motion for default judgment as to Defendant Robert Johnson. Dkt. No. 90. Johnson has not responded, and the time for do ing so has now passed. To the extent set forth above, the Court GRANTS Malibu Media's motion for default judgment. The Court finds an award of $20,000 just under the circumstances. In addition, injunctive relief is appropriate to the exten t set forth above. The issue of costs and fees will be resolved following the entry of final judgment in this case as contemplated by Rule 54(d). No final judgment shall issue at this time ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/29/2013.(DW)
March 7, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 130 Motion for Leave to Amend the ThirdAmended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint and attached exhibits [Dkts. 130-1, 130-2, 130-3, 130-4] as of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/7/2014. (JD)
May 1, 2014 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 150 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/1/2014. (CBU)
November 3, 2014 264 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 255 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply and 212 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES. For the reasons set forth below, the Magistrate Judge DENIES the motion to file a sur-reply and recommends that the Court GRANT IN PART and DENY IN PART the motion to exclude. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/3/2014.(CBU)
November 3, 2014 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 240 Motion to maintain docket no. 201 under seal, and the Magistrate Judge recommends that the Court DENY Plaintiff's motion for sanctions. The Court orders the Clerk to UNSEAL Docket Nos 208 and 244. Additionally, Defendant i s ordered to provide to Plaintiff the information regarding all individuals and entities to whom Defendant has provided access to Plaintiff's confidential information as set forth in section III (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/3/2014. (CBU)
November 19, 2014 272 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 236 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Delvan Neville From Testifying at Trial or on Summary Judgment filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. The Magistrate Judge recommends that the Court GRANT Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/19/2014.(CBU)
December 2, 2014 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 235 Motion for Sanctions filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (see Order for details). Copy to Jason H. Cooper and Michael Keith Lipscomb via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/2/2014.(SWM)
December 10, 2014 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge submitted his Report and Recommendation on Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses. [Dkt. 212.] The parties were a fforded due opportunity to file objections pursuant to statute and the rules of this Court; none were filed. The Court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. The Court accordingly GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Defendant's Motion. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/10/2014.(DW)
December 10, 2014 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge submitted his Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Delvan Neville from Testifying at Trial or on Summary Judgment. [Dkt. 236.] The parties were afforded due opportunity to file objections pursuant to statute and the rules of this Court; none were filed. The Court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. The Court accordingly GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/10/2014.(DW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOES 1-11
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Nicoletti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-11
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]