MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOES 1-4

Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-4
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01730
Filed: November 26, 2012
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER denying 28 Motion to Strike. Regarding Stear's 9th and 10th defenses, the Court will treat plaintiffs motion as a motion for more definite statement and orders defendant to amend his answer and affirmative defenses within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/17/2013 (copy sent to Eric Stear) (CBU)
November 25, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 44 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Donald Wilson. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/25/2013. Copies Mailed. (JD)
January 10, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 39 Motion to Dismiss filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC, 55 Report and Recommendations. The Court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Defendant William Julien's Counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/10/2014.(MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOES 1-4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Nicoletti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]