STEPP v. REXNORD INDUSTRIES, INC.

Defendant: REXNORD INDUSTRIES, INC.
Plaintiff: DAMON P. STEPP
Case Number: 1:2013cv00683
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying re 53 MOTION to Exclude Testimony for Witness's Failure to Appear filed by REXNORD INDUSTRIES, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/5/2014 (dist made)(CBU)
October 2, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 64 and 65 Motions to seek leave from the Court for filing belated requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2014 (dist made) (CBU)
October 2, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 Motion to seal email communication. Plaintiff's motion does not meet this standard. Plaintiff provides no explanation, analysis, or legal justification of any kind to support his request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2014 (dist made) (CBU)
October 2, 2014 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 and 84 Motions to seek leave of the Court for filing belated requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2014 (dist made) (CBU)
October 2, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion requesting reversal of the Protective Order 45 filed 2/21/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2014 (dist made) (CBU)
October 2, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion to Compel Defendant to Submit Application Data. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2014 (dist made) (CBU)
October 2, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Motion for appointment of a Special Master. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2014 (dist made) (CBU)
October 2, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion for re-opening of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2014 (dist made) (CBU)
October 2, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 103 and 125 Motions requesting the Court to use its inherent power to enforce sanctions and requesting sanctions against the defendant for discovery misconduct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2014 (dist made) (CBU)
December 9, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 107 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 127 Motion for Leave to File Belated Requests. Mr. Stepp failed to designate evidence showing that Rexnord's decision not to offer him employment was based on racial discrimination . Rexnord showed that its decision not to hire Mr. Stepp was based on a legitimate, non-discriminatory reason. Mr. Stepp failed to offer any evidence that Rexnord's reason was pretextual. As such, summary judgment is appropriate as a matte r of law. Rexnord's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 107) is GRANTED, and Mr. Stepp's claim is DISMISSED. Additionally, Mr. Stepp's "Motion to Seek Leave of Court for Filing Belated Request(s)" (Filing No. 127) is DENIED. Copy Mailed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/9/2014. (MGG)
May 8, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Motion for Default Judgment. The prescribed procedure, the date sixty days after April 29, 2013 is June 28, 2013, not June 27, 2013 as incorrectly calculated by Plaintiff. Accordingly, Defendant's Answer was timely filed and Plaintiff's Motion to Request Order for DefaultJudgment is hereby DENIED. Copy Mailed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/8/2014. (MGG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEPP v. REXNORD INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REXNORD INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Charles B. Baldwin
Represented By: Christopher C. Murray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMON P. STEPP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]