BVS, Inc v. CDW Direct, LLC et al

Plaintiff: BVS, Inc
Defendant: CDW Direct, LLC, Arrow Electronics, Inc and TSS Link, Inc
Case Number: 1:2011cv00079
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 68 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant CDW, Inc., and against BVS, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 3/28/2013. (skm)
April 2, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter an amended judgment that reflects judgment in favor of CDW and against BVS on BVS's 38 Complaint and dismissal without prejudice of CDW's 41 Third Party Complaint against Arrow Electronics, Inc., TSSLink, Inc., and Net App, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 4/2/2013. (skm)
February 14, 2015 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 140 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 141 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 2/14/2015. (njg)
February 19, 2015 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 101 Motion to Strike CDW Direct, LLC's Expert Witnesses. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 2/19/2015. (skm)
April 7, 2015 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 208 Motion to Review Clerk's Order; granting 209 Motion to Review Clerk's Order; granting 210 Motion to Review Clerk's Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assess and tax court costs to CDW Direct, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 4/7/2015. (pac)
September 6, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Additional Damage Claims Or To Continue Trial And Establish New Deadlines. The deadline for CDW, NetApp, Arrow, and TSSLink to disclose expert witnesses is extended to 10/19/2012. The deadline for BVS to disclose a rebuttal expert, if any, is extended to 11/2/2012. The deadline for completion of all discovery is extended to 11/16/2012. The deadline for filing dispostive motions is extended to 12/14/2012. The trial now scheduled for 1/22/2013 is continued. The trial will be rescheduled by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on a date not earlier than 4/15/2013. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 9/6/2012. (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BVS, Inc v. CDW Direct, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BVS, Inc
Represented By: Brian J Fagan
Represented By: Paul D Gamez
Represented By: Stephen J Holtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDW Direct, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Electronics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSS Link, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.