Progressive Casualty Insurance Company v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al

Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Arlene T Curry, Gary L Evans, David M Roederer, Barry E Backhaus, Ronald A Jorgensen, Charles D Terlouw, Jon G Cleghorn, Allen J Johnson, Michael W Dosland and Michael S Moderski
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv04041
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Donald E OBrien
Referring Judge: Paul A Zoss
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Compel and granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to Compel. See text of Order for details. All documents that Progressive and/or Everest are directed to produce in accordance with this order shall be produced no later than 9/12/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/22/14. (djs)
October 3, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order re 106 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. 102 Order is affirmed (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/3/2014. (des)
January 23, 2015 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT: granting 118 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 123 Motion for Hearing/Oral Argument; granting 125 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 145 Motion to Strike. Judgment shall enter in accordance with these dispositions. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 01/23/2015. (Mastalir, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene T Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Roederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry E Backhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Terlouw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon G Cleghorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen J Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Dosland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Moderski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Guy R Cook
Represented By: Matthew J Dendinger
Represented By: Lewis K Loss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]