Community Voice Line, LLC v. Great Lakes Communication Corp

Plaintiff: Community Voice Line, LLC
Defendant: Great Lakes Communication Corp
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv04048
Filed: May 15, 2012
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2013 158 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding 109 Community Voice Line's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Great Lakes Communication's First Amended Counterclaim. The Motion for Summary Judgment As To The Third Party Complaint is denied as moot, in light of the dismissal of all claims by GLCC against Blitz and Russell. CVL's Motion For Summary Judgment As To The First Amended Counterclaim is granted as to all of GLCC's counterclaims against CVL, and the counterclaim is dismissed. This matter will proceed to trial only on CVL's claims against GLCC. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/11/2013. (src)
January 23, 2014 213 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Overruling 195 Objection to 186 Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and affirming 186 Order. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 01/23/14. (kfs)
January 31, 2014 215 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Denying 162 Motion for Summary Judgment: Denying 185 Denying Motion to Strike: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 01/31/14. (kfs)
July 25, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion to Continue; denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice. See order for details. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 07/25/2012. (Mastalir, Roger)
May 6, 2014 270 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 228 Motion to Dismiss and 230 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant AudioNow's 228 Motion to Dismiss is denied in its entirety and Nelson Defendants' 230 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/6/14. (djs)
July 7, 2014 297 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Denying 271 Motion to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens, Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 07/07/14. (kfs)
February 1, 2013 71 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying in its entirety 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; denying 47 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 2/1/13. (djs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Community Voice Line, LLC v. Great Lakes Communication Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Voice Line, LLC
Represented By: Daniel L Hartnett
Represented By: Tammy Gail Cohen
Represented By: David S Sellman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Communication Corp
Represented By: Jeana L Goosmann
Represented By: Anthony Lee Osborn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]