Streeter v. Premier Staffing Services et alPER ORDER AT DOCKET 4, PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT $25 INSTALLMENT PAYMENTS BY THE 20TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL FILING FEE IS PD IN FULL

Defendant: Tur-Pak Foods, Inc and Premier Staffing Services
Plaintiff: Brian J Streeter
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv04097
Filed: October 30, 2012
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 14 Tur-Paks Motion for Summary Judgment. Tur-Pak is hereby dismissed from this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/6/13. (copy w/nef mailed to plaintiff) (djs)
April 1, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall enter against plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 4/1/2014. (copy w/nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
April 30, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Amended Complaint filed by Brian J Streeter. The clerk's office is directed to serve the second amended complaint on the defendants without the prepayment of fees and costs. A copy of this order is to accompany the documents being served. The defendants shall file an answer or other dispositive motion by no later than 5/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 4/30/13. (copy w/nef mailed to pro se plaintiff; copy w/nef, second amended complaint, summons and case packet sent via certified mail to defendants) (djs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Streeter v. Premier Staffing Services et alPER ORDER AT DOCKET 4, PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT $25 INSTALLMENT PAYMENTS BY THE 20TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL FILING FEE IS PD IN FULL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tur-Pak Foods, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Staffing Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J Streeter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]