Gulick v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Scott Gulick
Case Number: 5:2013cv04038
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommend that the Commissioners decision be reversed and this case be remanded for further proceedings consistent with this report. Judgment should be entered in favor of Plaintiff David Scott Gulick and against the Commissioner re 3 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 1/17/2014. (des)
March 11, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 13 Report and Recommendation. The Commissioner's decision is reversed and this case is remanded for further proceedings consistent with Judge Strand's R and R. The Clerk shall enter judgment against the Commissioner and in favor of Gulick. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 3/11/2014. (src)
August 27, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Attorney Fees. I award Gulick $3,700 in attorneys fees under the EAJA, which is subject to offset for any debts Gulick may owe to the United States. The fee award shall be paid by the Social Security Administration. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 8/27/14. (djs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulick v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Stephanie Johnson Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scott Gulick
Represented By: Ruth M Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]