National Surety Corporation v. Dustex Corporation et al

Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Municipal Electric Utility of the City of Cedar Falls, Iowa, Miron Construction Co., Inc. and Dustex Corporation
Plaintiff: National Surety Corporation
Case Number: 6:2013cv02004
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Black Hawk
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 143 Motion to Set Aside/Reconsider 142 Order. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 6/27/2014. (pac)
September 24, 2014 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court refers this matter to the Magistrate Judge to conduct an evidentiary hearing on defendants' affirmative defense of equitable estoppel and file a report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 9/24/2014. (skm)
June 21, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Continue Discovery to Obtain Facts Necessary to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dustex Corporation and 33 Joinder in Motion re 32 Motion to Continue Discovery filed by Miron Construction and Co., Inc. Defendant's resistances to Plaintiff's 28 and 29 Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed not later than 8/21/2013. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 06/21/2013. (skm)
August 19, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Resist Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dustex Corporation and 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend/Correct deadline filed by Dustex C orporation. The deadline for Dustex and Miron to respond to 28 Motion for Summary Judgment against Miron Construction Co filed by National Surety Corporation and 29 Motion for Summary Judgment against Dustex Corporation filed by National Surety Corporation is extended to 11/15/2013. NSC must file its replies, if any, not later than 12/15/2013. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 8/19/2013. (skm)
January 6, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Compel. Not later than 10 days following the entry of this Order, Dustex must produce those documents described in National Surety's request for production number 13. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/6/2014. (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Surety Corporation v. Dustex Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Municipal Electric Utility of the City of Cedar Falls, Iowa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miron Construction Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustex Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Surety Corporation
Represented By: Douglas R Oelschlaeger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]