Pool et al v. Orkin, Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Lonnie Pool and Terry Pool
Defendant: Orkin, Inc, Orkin Exterminating Co., Inc. and Rollins Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00091
Filed: May 29, 2009
 
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
Office: Davenport Office
County: Scott
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: John A. Jarvey
Referring Judge: Ross A. Walters
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2010 102 Sealed Document (Jury Verdict). (rjl)
November 15, 2010 101 JURY VERDICT. (rjl)
November 15, 2010 100 Jury Question and Court's Answer. (rjl) (Main Document 100 replaced on 11/15/2010) (rjl, ).
November 15, 2010 99 Witness and Exhibit List. (rjl)
November 15, 2010 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Jarvey: Fourth Day of Jury Trial held on 11/12/2010. (Court Reporter Linda Egbers.) (rjl)
November 15, 2010 97 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Jarvey: Third day of Jury Trial held on 11/10/2010. (Court Reporter Terr1 Martin.) (rjl) Modified on 11/15/2010 (rmj).
November 15, 2010 96 Final Jury Instructions. (mem) (Main Document 96 replaced on 11/15/2010) (rjl, ).
November 11, 2010 95 BRIEF regarding jury instructions by Orkin, Inc. (Nelson, Steven)
November 9, 2010 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Jarvey: Jury Trial Day 2 held on 11/9/2010. (Court Reporter Linda Egbers.) (kmw) (Main Document 94 replaced on 11/10/2010) (rjl, ).
November 8, 2010 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Jarvey: Jury Trial Day 1 held on 11/8/2010. (Court Reporter Linda Egbers.) (rjl)
November 8, 2010 92 Preliminary Jury Instructions. (mem)
November 8, 2010 91 Sealed Document (Challenge Sheet). (rjl)
November 5, 2010 90 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 , 52 and 53 Motions in Limine; denying 55 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John A. Jarvey on 11/5/2010. (mem)
October 29, 2010 89 Featured Case Amended Proposed PRETRIAL ORDER (with modifications by the Court). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/29/2010. (kln)
October 29, 2010 88 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 79 plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend proposed order on final pretrial conference. The parties should note the Court has made certain changes to the Amended Proposed Order as referenced therein. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/29/2010. (kln)
October 28, 2010 87 REPLY to re 80 Brief/Other Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Objections to Former Testimony by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
October 28, 2010 86 RESPONSE to Motion re 79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Proposed Pretrial Order Motion for Leave to Amend Proposed Order on Final Pre-Trial COnference - Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Proposed Order on Final Pretrial Conferencefiled by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Replies due by 11/8/2010.(Humphrey, Marc)
October 27, 2010 85 STATEMENT Stipulated Statement of the Case by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
October 27, 2010 84 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER accelerating response. Plaintiff shall respond to defendant's objections 83 to plaintiff's motion to amend pretrial order 79 by the close of business 10/28/2010. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/27/2010. (kln)
October 27, 2010 83 RESPONSE to Motion re 79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Proposed Pretrial Order Motion for Leave to Amend Proposed Order on Final Pre-Trial COnferenceFirst MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Proposed Pretrial Order Motion for Leave to Amend Proposed Order on Final Pre-Trial COnference filed by Orkin, Inc. Replies due by 11/8/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Steven)
October 26, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. See ruling for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/26/2010. (kln)
October 26, 2010 81 BRIEF Response to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief by Orkin, Inc. (Nelson, Steven)
October 26, 2010 80 BRIEF Objections to Plaintiffs' Transcript Designations of Former Testimony by Orkin, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Nelson, Steven)
October 25, 2010 79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Proposed Pretrial Order Motion for Leave to Amend Proposed Order on Final Pre-Trial COnference by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 11/12/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Humphrey, Marc)
October 25, 2010 78 Exhibit List Revised Exhibit List for Final Pre-Trial Order by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
October 25, 2010 77 SUPPLEMENT TO RESPONSE to resistance to defendant's 52 Second MOTION in Limine filed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Replies due by 11/4/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Humphrey, Marc) Modified text on 10/26/2010 (ljf, ).
October 22, 2010 76 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Exhibit List (Second Revised) by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
October 22, 2010 75 REPLY in Support of re 53 Third MOTION in Limine filed by Orkin, Inc.(Nelson, Steven)
October 22, 2010 74 REPLY in Support of re 52 Second MOTION in Limine filed by Orkin, Inc.(Nelson, Steven)
October 22, 2010 73 REPLY in Support of re 51 First MOTION in Limine filed by Orkin, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, and C)(Nelson, Steven)
October 22, 2010 72 RESPONSE to Motion re 55 First MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Re: Testimony of C. Gorecki filed by Orkin, Inc. Replies due by 11/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Steven)
October 20, 2010 71 RESPONSE to Motion re 70 First MOTION to Compel Defendants' Discovery Responses(Oral Argument and Expedited Relief Requested) filed by Orkin, Inc. Replies due by 11/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A and B)(Nelson, Steven)
October 18, 2010 70 First MOTION to Compel Defendants' Discovery Responses(Oral Argument and Expedited Relief Requested) by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 11/4/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Humphrey, Marc)
October 15, 2010 69 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER FOLLOWING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/15/2010. (kln)
October 15, 2010 68 Featured Case STIPULATED PRETRIAL ORDER. Handwritten note on p. 1 reads "Except for Part II pertaining to exhibits. A substitute exhibit list will be submitted by October 22, 2010. See Order Following Final Pretrial Conference entered this date." Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/15/2010. (kln)
October 15, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/15/2010. (kln)
October 15, 2010 66 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Revised Exhibit List by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
October 14, 2010 65 TRIAL BRIEF by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
October 14, 2010 64 Proposed Jury Instructions by Orkin, Inc. (Nelson, Steven)
October 14, 2010 63 Proposed Voir Dire by Orkin, Inc. (Nelson, Steven)
October 14, 2010 62 RESPONSE to Motion re 53 Third MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Resistance to Defendants' Third Motion in Limine filed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Replies due by 10/25/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Humphrey, Marc)
October 14, 2010 61 RESPONSE to Motion re 52 Second MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Resistacne to Defendnats' Second Motion in Limine filed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Replies due by 10/25/2010.(Humphrey, Marc)
October 14, 2010 60 TRIAL BRIEF by Orkin, Inc. (Nelson, Steven)
October 13, 2010 59 RESPONSE to Motion re 51 First MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Resistance to Defendants' First Motion in Limine filed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Replies due by 10/25/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Humphrey, Marc)
October 13, 2010 58 Errata Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine re 55 Motion in Limine filed by Terry Pool, Lonnie Pool. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Humphrey, Marc)
October 13, 2010 57 Proposed Voir Dire by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
October 13, 2010 56 Proposed Jury Instructions by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
October 13, 2010 55 First MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Responses due by 11/1/2010 (Humphrey, Marc)
October 8, 2010 54 Proposed Pretrial Order on Final Pre-Trial Conference by Orkin, Inc. (Hall, Tara)
October 8, 2010 53 Third MOTION in Limine by Orkin, Inc. Responses due by 10/25/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Third Motion in Limine, # 2 Appendix First Part, # 3 Appendix Second Part)(Hall, Tara)
October 8, 2010 52 Second MOTION in Limine by Orkin, Inc. Responses due by 10/25/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Second Motion in Limine, # 2 Appendix First Part, # 3 Appendix Second Part)(Hall, Tara)
October 8, 2010 51 First MOTION in Limine by Orkin, Inc. Responses due by 10/25/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of First Motion in Limine, # 2 Appendix First Part, # 3 Appendix Second Part)(Hall, Tara)
September 29, 2010 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Agreed Motion for Protective Order with modification on page 5, para. 7 " other than the Court, Court personnel and official court reporter" inserted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 9/29/2010. (kln)
September 29, 2010 49 MOTION for Protective Order by Orkin, Inc.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 10/18/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Protective Order)(Nelson, Steven)
September 29, 2010 48 TEXT ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney, Daniel J. Gerber. Signed by Clerk Marjorie E. Krahn on 09/29/10. (bp )
September 29, 2010 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-1237913 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Orkin, Inc.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Nelson, Steven)
September 28, 2010 46 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's schedule, the final pretrial conference is continued from October 8, 2010 to Friday, October 15, 2010, at 9:00 a.m. The final pretrial conference will be held before the undersigned by telephone conference call. Counsel should call the Court's conference line at (515) 284-6267 and enter code 116267 at the prompt to be connected to the call. All parties should comply with the requirements for final pretrial conference previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 9/28/2010. (nsr)
September 16, 2010 45 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER RESETTING SETTING TRIAL DATE. Due to multiple conflicts in the court's criminal trial calendar, the jury trial of this matter is RESET for 11/8/2010 at 8:30 AM in Room 242, 2nd Floor, Davenport, before Judge John A. Jarvey. Signed by Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/16/2010. (mem)
August 30, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John A. Jarvey on 8/30/2010. (mem)
August 12, 2010 43 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 42 defendants' unresisted motion for permission to take expert deposition after the discovery deadline. The parties are granted permission to postpone the deposition of plaintiff's rebuttal expert, Ron Stevens, to an agreed date after September 10, 2010. However, the parties shall schedule the deposition as soon as possible after September 10, 2010, so as not to impact the trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/12/2010. (nsr)
August 12, 2010 42 Unresisted MOTION Permission to take expert deposition after discovery deadline by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/30/2010 (Nelson, Steven)
August 6, 2010 41 REPLY re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Disputed Facts)(Nelson, Steven)
July 29, 2010 40 Errata Plaintiffs' Supplement to Appendix in Support of Resistance to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 36 Response to Motion,,, filed by Terry Pool, Lonnie Pool. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix)(Humphrey, Marc)
July 28, 2010 39 NOTICE/BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RESISTANCE by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool re 36 Response to Motion. (bp )
July 28, 2010 38 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 37 plaintiffs' motion for permission to file an overlength brief in support of resistance to defendants' motion for summary judgment. The case manager shall detach and separately file the brief attached to the motion, linking it to plaintiffs' resistance 36 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/28/2010.(kln)
July 27, 2010 37 First MOTION to file overlength brief Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Resistance to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/13/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Resistance to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Humphrey, Marc)
July 27, 2010 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Resistance to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Replies due by 8/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Plaintiffs' Statement of Disputed Facts Which Preclude Summary Judgement, # 3 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix in Support of Resistance to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Appendix Appendix Part 1, # 5 Appendix Appendix Part 2, # 6 Appendix Appendix Part 3, # 7 Appendix Appendix Part 4, # 8 Appendix Appendix Part 5, # 9 Appendix Appendix Part 6, # 10 Appendix Appendix Part 7, # 11 Appendix Appendix Part 8, # 12 Appendix Appendix Part 9, # 13 Appendix Appendix Part 10, # 14 Appendix Appendix Part 11)(Humphrey, Marc)
July 27, 2010 35 RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment Resistance filed by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc. Replies due by 8/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Resistance, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts in Resistance, # 3 Statement of Facts Additional Facts, # 4 Appendix in Support of Resistance)(Hall, Tara)
July 20, 2010 34 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs and defendants have filed separate motions requesting an extension of time to respond to the motions for summary judgment 31 33 . Neither motion for extension of time is resisted. The time for response to the motions for summary judgment 21 24 is extended to and including July 27, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/20/2010 (nsr)
July 19, 2010 33 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/5/2010 (Hall, Tara)
July 19, 2010 32 RESPONSE to Motion re 31 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Nonresistance filed by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc. Replies due by 7/29/2010.(Hall, Tara)
July 19, 2010 31 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/5/2010 (Humphrey, Marc)
July 16, 2010 30 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 29 plaintiffs' motion to clarify, amend or expand and supplement ruling. Defendants do not resist the clarification sought by plaintiff. Defendants shall produce a set of the documents produced in the Devine case in the electronic format in which they were provided previously to the plaintiffs' counsel subject to the entry of an appropriate protective order. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/16/2010.(kln)
July 16, 2010 29 RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Order on Motion for Extension of R16/Scheduling Order Deadlines,,, Nonresistance to Plaintiff's Motion filed by Rollins Inc. Replies due by 7/26/2010.(Hall, Tara)
July 14, 2010 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Order on Motion for Extension of R16/Scheduling Order Deadlines,,, by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/2/2010 (Swaim, Justin)
July 1, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 defendants' Motion for Extension of Time of R16/Scheduling Order Deadlines; granting in part and denying in part 15 plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time of R16/Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/16/2010. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/1/2010. (kln)
June 30, 2010 26 TEXT MINUTE: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2010 re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of Fact Discovery Deadline filed by Rollins Inc, Orkin, Inc, 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Close of Discovery filed by Terry Pool, Lonnie Pool. Attorney Justin Swaim appeared for plaintiff; attorney Steve Nelson for defendant. Oral argument on motions. Ruling reserved. (Court Reporter Eileen Hicks.) (kln)
June 29, 2010 25 NOTICE/BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment (bp )
June 28, 2010 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Responses due by 7/22/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Brief in Support)(Swaim, Justin)
June 28, 2010 23 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 22 defendants' motion for permission to file overlength brief in support of motion for summary judgment. The case manager shall detach and separately file the brief attached to the motion, linking it to defendants' summary judgment motion 21 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 6/28/2010.(kln)
June 28, 2010 22 MOTION to file overlength brief in support of motion for summary judgment by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 7/15/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Nelson, Steven)
June 28, 2010 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc. Responses due by 7/22/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Appendix Cover Sheet, # 3 Appendix Exhibits)(Nelson, Steven)
June 14, 2010 20 Errata Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Resistance to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time for Closing of Discovery(Correction of Service Date) re 18 Reply to Response, filed by Terry Pool, Lonnie Pool. (Humphrey, Marc)
June 14, 2010 19 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS. Before the Court for ruling is defendant's Motion for Limited Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline 14 and plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Close of Discovery 15 . The Court will hold a telephone conference hearing on these motions commencing at 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, June 30, 2010. Counsel should call the Court's conference line at (515) 284-6267 and enter code 116267 at the prompt to be connected to the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 6/14/2010. (nsr)
June 14, 2010 18 REPLY Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Resistance to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time for Close of Discovery re 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Close of Discovery filed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool.(Humphrey, Marc)
June 10, 2010 17 RESPONSE to Motion re 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Close of Discovery filed by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc. Replies due by 6/21/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Nelson, Steven)
June 8, 2010 16 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER ACCELERATING TIME FOR RESPONSE. Any response to plaintiffs' "Motion for Extension of Time for Close of Discovery (and Response to Defendants' Motion for Limited Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline)" 15 shall be filed by the close of business on Thursday, June 10, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 6/8/2010. (nsr)
June 7, 2010 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Close of Discovery by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 6/24/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Humphrey, Marc)
May 28, 2010 14 MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of Fact Discovery Deadline by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 6/14/2010 (Nelson, Steven)
April 2, 2010 13 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 12 defendants' unresisted motion for extension of time for disclosure of expert witnesses and expert discovery. Defendants' expert witness disclosure deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) is extended to 5/27/2010. Plaintiffs' rebuttal expert witness disclosure deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) is extended to 6/17/2010. The discovery deadline with respect to expert discovery is extended to 7/7/2010. All other deadlines, including the trial and final pretrial conference dates, remain set as previously ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 4/2/2010.(kln)
April 2, 2010 12 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of expert witnesses and expert discovery by Orkin, Inc, Rollins Inc.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 4/19/2010 (Nelson, Steven)
December 29, 2009 11 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 10 plaintiffs' unresisted motion for extension of time for disclosure of expert witnesses and discovery deadline. The deadlines are extended as follows: Plaintiffs' expert witness disclosures in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) are due by February 11, 2010. Defendants' expert witness disclosures in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) are due by April 12, 2010. Plaintiffs' rebuttal witness disclosures in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) are due by May 3, 2010. Discovery shall close, and not be propounded, by June 7, 2010. All other deadlines and trial remain as previously set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 12/29/2009. (nsr)
December 28, 2009 10 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plainitffs' Expert Witness Disclosure Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Responses due by 1/14/2010 (Humphrey, Marc)
November 24, 2009 9 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 7 plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend complaint and jury demand. Counsel for defendants does not object. Plaintiffs have already filed the First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand 8 . It may stand in the record as filed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 11/24/2009. (kln)
November 23, 2009 8 Amended AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Compliant and Jury Demand against Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool., filed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool.(Humphrey, Marc)
November 23, 2009 7 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Compliant and Jury Demand Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Responses due by 12/10/2009 (Humphrey, Marc)
September 28, 2009 6 Featured Case ORDER granting 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Add Parties deadline 11/25/2009. Motion to Amend Pleadings deadline 11/25/2009. Plaintiffs' Expert Witness disclosures due by 12/28/2009. Defendants' Expert Witness disclosures due by 2/25/2010. Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Witness disclosures due by 3/25/2010. Discovery closes 5/25/2010. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/28/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM by Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 at 9:00 AM in Davenport - Room 120 - 1st Floor before Judge John A. Jarvey. Estimated length of trial is 5 days. See order for other particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 9/28/2009. (nsr)
September 25, 2009 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Humphrey, Marc)
August 3, 2009 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Rollins Inc, Orkin, Inc.(Nelson, Steven)
July 16, 2009 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Rollins Inc served on 7/10/2009, answer due 7/30/2009 (Humphrey, Marc)
July 16, 2009 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Orkin, Inc served on 7/10/2009, answer due 7/30/2009. (Humphrey, Marc)
May 29, 2009 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against all defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 350., filed by Lonnie Pool, Terry Pool. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/28/2009. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/28/2009.(Humphrey, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pool et al v. Orkin, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Pool
Represented By: Justin K Swaim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Pool
Represented By: Justin K Swaim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orkin, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orkin Exterminating Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollins Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]