Andre v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al Featured Case

Defendant: Robert W Nye, Bryan M Arzani, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints and Robert C Oaks
Plaintiff: Lee Harlow Andre
Case Number: 4:2006cv00574
Filed: December 4, 2006
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Polk
Referring Judge: Celeste F. Bremer
Presiding Judge: James E. Gritzner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2006 1
COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by Lee Harlow Andre. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/3/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rmj)
December 4, 2006 2
Summons Issued as to Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Robert C Oaks, Robert W Nye, and Bryan M Arzani. (rmj)
December 7, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER. This case is dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is directed to refund the filing fee to Plaintiff. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge James E. Gritzner on 12/7/2006. (nlh)
December 21, 2006 4
MOTION for Reconsideration re 3 Order by Pro Se Plaintiff Lee Harlow Andre. Responses due by 1/8/2007 (lh, )
December 22, 2006 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 4 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge James E. Gritzner on 12/22/2006. (nlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andre v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Nye
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan M Arzani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Oaks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Harlow Andre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]