Stephenson et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Armour D Stephenson, III, Patrick G Stephenson and Michael D Rahn
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Dukes, Inc, Rourke Aviation, Inc, Foster's Propeller Service, Inc, Aircraft Accessories of Oklahoma, Inc, Richard M Abernathy and Kim Lee
Case Number: 2:2007cv02494
Filed: October 16, 2007
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT re 109 Plaintiffs application for approval of wrongful death settlement. This settlement is only between Plaintiffs and defendant Goodrich Pump & Engine Control Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/28/2009. (ses) (Text added on 5/28/2009. (mg))
October 5, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 141 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Alternative Motion to Certify Question to Supreme Court of Kansas; and granting 147 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant is awarded summary judgment on plaintiffs' survival claims for pre-impact emotional distress. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/05/2009. (ses)
April 2, 2010 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 176 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on plaintiffs' strick liability and warranty claims - and defendant is awarded judgment on those claims; denying 178 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by plaintiffs' expert Donald Sommer; denying 180 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on defendant's attempt to compare the fault of the pilot; granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion to Exclude expert testimony by defendant's experts Gregory Feith, John Maris, and Allen Parmet - The motion is granted with respect to Dr. Parmets opinions concerning the pilots ethanol level, medication side effects unrelated to susceptibility to spatial disorientation, rogue pilot behavior, and the credibility of the pilots spouse, and such testimony will be excluded at trial; the motion to exclude is denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/02/2010. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armour D Stephenson, III
Represented By: Alison N. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick G Stephenson
Represented By: Alison N. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Rahn
Represented By: Alison N. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: William L. Yocum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dukes, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rourke Aviation, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster's Propeller Service, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aircraft Accessories of Oklahoma, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Abernathy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]