Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Big River Telephone Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Defendant: Big River Telephone Company, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv02046
Filed: January 24, 2008
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2009 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/4/2009. (kg)
June 12, 2009 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 157 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/12/2009. (ah)
June 29, 2009 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 201 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/29/2009. (kg)
July 8, 2009 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: It is ordered that certain terms in the patents at issue in this action are construed as set forth herein. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/08/09.(mg)
July 21, 2009 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 214 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/21/2009. (ah)
August 18, 2009 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring Big River to pay Sprint the reasonable fees incurred by Sprint in bringing its motion to compel, in the amount of $7,773.37, by September 4, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/18/2009.(ah)
August 20, 2009 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 159 motion to compel; denying as moot 154 motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/20/2009. (ah)
September 2, 2009 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 178 Big River's Motion to Compel and ordering Sprint to either further supplement its privilege log or file a motion for protective order relieving it of this obligation. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/2/2009. (ah)
September 8, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Strike defendant Big River's eighth affirmative defense relating to license is hereby sticken from its 7 Answer. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/8/2008. (ses)
September 16, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/16/08. (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Big River Telephone Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big River Telephone Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]