Valiente v. Dineequity, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Antonio Fidelis Valiente
Defendant: Dineequity, Inc., Applebee's International, Inc. and Weight Watchers International, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv02416
Filed: September 9, 2008
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2009 123 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 109 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/30/2009. (ck)
April 7, 2010 183 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Re: RICO Causes Of Action 167 filed on February 5, 2010 is SUSTAINED. All other pending motions, including Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification 143 filed on November 5, 2009, are OVERRULED as moot. (ck)
September 9, 2008 1
COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Antonio Fidelis Valiente.(ta)
May 1, 2009 68 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 53 Defendants' Request For Judicial Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 5/1/09. (tjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Valiente v. Dineequity, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fidelis Valiente
Represented By: James P. Frickleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dineequity, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applebee's International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weight Watchers International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]