Navigato v. SJ Restaurants, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Michelle L. Navigato
Defendant: SJ Restaurants, LLC, Table Rock Restaurants, LLC, Ozark Restaurants, Inc. and Restaurant Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02101
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Rent Lease & Ejectment Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 04/07/2009.(nf)
August 14, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER overruling 5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/14/2009. (nf)
January 10, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER issuing findings of fact and conclusions of law following trial on 7/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/10/11. (mh)
March 16, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 62 Motion for Additional Expert Fees, and Determining Plaintiff's Damages Pursuant to the Affidavit of Jay Hill 61 . See MEMORANDUM AND ORDER for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 3/16/2011. (sr)
September 14, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion to Register Judgment in the Western District of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 9/14/2011. (byk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navigato v. SJ Restaurants, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L. Navigato
Represented By: Richard G. Tucker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJ Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: David A. Schatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Table Rock Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: David A. Schatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Schatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurant Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Schatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]