ACE USA et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: ACE USA and ACE European Group Limited
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv02194
Filed: April 15, 2009
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying in part as moot 91 and taking under advisement in part 91 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/5/2011. (mh)
June 6, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/6/2011. (mh)
July 25, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 121 Defendant's Motion to Compel or Alternatively for Sanctions. The parties shall meet and confer regarding a mutually convenient time within the next fourteen (14) days for Plaintiff AEG to produce a designee who is competently prepared to fully and responsibly address questions posed regarding Topics 1, 2, 3, 4, 8, 12, 13, and 14, as set forth in Defendant's Notice to Take 30(b)(6) Deposition. It is further order that Defe ndant's request for sanctions against Plaintiff AEG is granted, and Defendant shall file by August 8, 2011 an affidavit itemizing the reasonable attorney fees and expenses incurred in traveling to and taking the 30(b)(6) deposition. Plaintiff A EG shall have until August 22, 2011 to file any response to the affidavit. It is further ordered that Defendant's request to extend the dispositive motion deadline and trial setting is denied without prejudice to the request being brought to the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 7/25/2011. (byk)
August 15, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further, that Plaintiffs' 106 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On Defendant's Defenses is overruled to the extent that it pertains to defendants Section 10709 defense, and overruling plaintiffs motion for summary judgment on defendants other defenses as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/15/2011. (mg)
December 7, 2011 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling plaintiffs' 167 Motion To Alter Or Amend Judgment, and Leave To Amend Their Theory Of Recovery. Further, overruling plaintiffs' 170 Request For Oral Argument. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 12/7/2011. (mg)
March 26, 2012 183 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's 179 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Memorandum In Support Of Union Pacific's Bill Of Costs. Further, plaintiffs' 178 Objections To Defendant's Bill Of Costs is sustained. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/26/2012. (mg)
November 8, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER taking under advisement 43 Motion to Compel and setting the motion for hearing at 1:00 p.m. on 11/15/10 before Judge David J. Waxse. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/8/10. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ACE USA et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE USA
Represented By: David J. Kornelis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE European Group Limited
Represented By: David J. Kornelis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]