Rajala v. Gardner et al

Plaintiff: Eric C. Rajala
Defendant: Robert H. Gardner, Robbin M. Gardner, R. James Ansel, Virginia Z. Ansel, William W. Stevens, Akiko N. Stevens, Lookout Windpower Holding Company, LLC, Lookout Windpower, LLC, Forward Windpower Holding Company, LLC, Foward Windpower, LLC, Edison Mission Energy, Mission Wind Pennsylvania, Inc., Mission Wind PA Two, Inc. and Mission Wind PA Three, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv02482
Filed: September 11, 2009
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 55 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 57 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 58 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Dismiss. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/4/2011. (alm)
May 20, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 119 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/20/2011. (cm)
December 13, 2011 191 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 176 Trustee's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 12/13/2011. (sj)
December 19, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER consolidating cases and denying as moot 158 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; denying as moot 166 Motion to Strike. Case number 11-2524 is ordered consolidated with this case for all purposes and this case, 09-2482, is designated as the lead case. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/19/2011. (alm)
February 3, 2012 207 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 197 Trustee's Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 2/3/2012. (sj)
April 9, 2012 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion for Judgment; granting 147 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 183 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 195 Motion for Summary Judgment. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/9/2012. (alm)
April 12, 2012 219 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting with conditions 206 Certain Defendants' Motion to Compel. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 4/12/2012. (sj)
May 8, 2012 236 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 223 Motion to Certify; finding as moot 233 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 234 Motion to Strike. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/8/2012. (cm)
June 14, 2012 249 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 244 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and 244 for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/14/2012. (ses)
July 3, 2013 281 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 255 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 256 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denied as moot 274 Motion to Enforce. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/3/2013. (cm)
September 10, 2014 360 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 340 Motion for Order. Granting the Stay is conditional upon each defendant posting a supersedeas bond. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/10/2014. (cm)
September 29, 2014 361 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 338 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 343 Motion for Judgment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/29/2014. (cm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rajala v. Gardner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric C. Rajala
Represented By: Michael P. Healy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Gardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbin M. Gardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. James Ansel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Z. Ansel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Stevens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akiko N. Stevens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lookout Windpower Holding Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lookout Windpower, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Windpower Holding Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foward Windpower, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Mission Energy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Wind Pennsylvania, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Wind PA Two, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Wind PA Three, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]