Fifth Third Bank v. Sekoch Insurance, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank
Defendant: Sekoch Insurance, LLC, Roy Sekoch and Donna Sekoch
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02227
Filed: April 20, 2010
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wesley E. Brown
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2010 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 12/17/2010.Mailed to pro se party Sekoch Insurance, LLC, Roy Sekoch, Donna Sekoch by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70092820000188198773, 70092820000188198780, 70092820000398340443, 70092820000398340450, 70092820000398340467. (aa) Modified on 12/17/2010 to add certified mail tracking numbers (aa).
January 6, 2011 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part as to Defendant Donna Sekoch and denying in part as to Sekoch Insurance, LLLC regarding 22 Motion for Reconsideration. The default judgment against Donna Sekoch shall be set aside. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 1/6/2011. Mailed to pro se parties Sekoch Insurance, LLC, Roy Sekoch, Donna Sekoch by regular mail. (alm)
September 30, 2011 62 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 27 Motion to Dismiss; denying 42 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 9/30/2011.Mailed to pro se party Donna Sekoch by regular mail. (aa)
March 21, 2012 64 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 56 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/20/2012. Mailed to pro se parties Roy SeKoch and Donna SeKoch by regular mail. (mss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fifth Third Bank v. Sekoch Insurance, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: J. Nick Badgerow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sekoch Insurance, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Sekoch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Sekoch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]